TN HB0937 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-20)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases pay supplement from $600 to $800 for police officers and firefighters who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases pay supplement from $600 to $800 for police officers and firefighters who complete 40 hours of in-service training. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 24, Part 2 and Title 38, Chapter 8, Part 1.

Sponsors

Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]
Rep. Jason Potts [D]Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]
Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. Larry Miller [D]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Joe Towns [D]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Jim Coley [R]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]
Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Bill Beck [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]
Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04HouseComp. SB subst.
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on cal. Local Committee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0793 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-18 - Signed by Governor.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback