TN HB0716 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates per se DUI offense of driving while the person's blood includes any amount of Schedule I controlled substance or Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substance that cannot be dispensed without a prescription when the person does not have a valid prescription; enhances criminal penalties for impaired driving within a school zone. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates per se DUI offense of driving while the person's blood includes any amount of Schedule I controlled substance or Schedule II, III, IV, or V controlled substance that cannot be dispensed without a prescription when the person does not have a valid prescription; enhances criminal penalties for impaired driving within a school zone. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 55.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced behind the budget
2019-04-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-17HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-04-10HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-20HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-05HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1409 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback