SD SB86 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain requirements regarding the review of initiated amendments to the Constitution and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain requirements regarding the review of initiated amendments to the Constitution and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-02 - House - House of Representatives: Do Pass (Y: 58 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House State Affairs: Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate State Affairs: Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSigned by the Governor on March 29, 2021 S.J. 494
2021-03-09SenateDelivered to the Governor on March 09, 2021 S.J. 460
2021-03-08HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 527
2021-03-04SenateSigned by the President S.J. 422
2021-03-02HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 9. H.J. 471
2021-03-01HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 1
2021-03-01HouseScheduled for hearing H.J. 1
2021-02-10HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 272
2021-02-09SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 229
2021-02-05SenateState Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
2021-02-05SenateState Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 86A
2021-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2021-01-21SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 88

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback