SD SB59 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise certain provisions regarding public records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise certain provisions regarding public records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House State Affairs Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March 21, 2019 S.J. 733
2019-03-11HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 672
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 701
2019-03-07HouseSigned by the President S.J. 647
2019-03-06HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 630
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 9. H.J. 608
2019-03-04HouseHouse of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 607 Amendment 59wc
2019-02-28HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 590
2019-02-27HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 571
2019-02-26HouseHouse of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
2019-02-25HouseState Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 4. H.J. 514
2019-02-25HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-05HouseFirst read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 292
2019-01-31SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 10. S.J. 252
2019-01-31SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 252 Amendment 59jb
2019-01-29SenateJudiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 208
2019-01-29SenateJudiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 59ja
2019-01-29SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-22SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 138

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=59&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB59P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB59SJU.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB59S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB59H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB59ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27552&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27738&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28751&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29112&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29238&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback