SD SB15 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Signed by the Governor on March, 19, 2019 S.J. 732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Define solar energy facilities, establish certain provisions regarding solar energy permits, and revise the procedures by which the Public Utilities Commission processes facility permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Define solar energy facilities, establish certain provisions regarding solar energy permits, and revise the procedures by which the Public Utilities Commission processes facility permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in amendments (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Deferred to another day (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseSigned by the Governor on March, 19, 2019 S.J. 732
2019-03-12HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 12, 2019
2019-03-12HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 747
2019-03-11HouseSigned by the President S.J. 685
2019-03-11HouseSenate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 9. S.J. 680
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 694 Amendment 15yta
2019-03-07HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 17. H.J. 693
2019-03-06HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 657
2019-03-06HouseCommerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 15cc
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-03-04HouseCommerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed
2019-03-04HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
2019-03-04HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-02-26HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 551
2019-02-25SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 21, NAYS 14. S.J. 506
2019-02-25SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 505 Amendment 15cb
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Title amended, Passed S.J. 446 Amendment 15cta
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
2019-02-21SenateCommerce and Energy Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 15ca
2019-02-21SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-19SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-14SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-17SenateCommerce and Energy Deferred to another day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
2019-01-17SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-15SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 24

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/Bill.aspx?Bill=15&Session=2019
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15P.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15SCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15S.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15HCO.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15H.pdf
Texthttp://sdlegislature.gov/docs/legsession/2019/Bills/SB15ENR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=27255&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28580&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=28797&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29092&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29243&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29340&Session=2019
Roll Callhttp://sdlegislature.gov/Legislative_Session/Bills/RollCall.aspx?Vote=29375&Session=2019

Bill Comments

feedback