SD SB136 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 26-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 715
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Permit and regulate the practice of licensed certified professional midwives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permit and regulate the practice of licensed certified professional midwives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-01 - House of Representatives - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 52 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House of Representatives - House Health and Human Services Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-10HouseSigned by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 715
2017-03-07HouseDelivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 626
2017-03-06HouseSigned by the Speaker H.J. 675
2017-03-02HouseSigned by the President S.J. 599
2017-03-01HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 16. H.J. 591
2017-02-28HouseHealth and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 3. H.J. 564
2017-02-28HouseScheduled for hearing
2017-02-16HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 420
2017-02-15SenateSenate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 405
2017-02-15SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 405 Amendment 136sa
2017-02-15SenateSenate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 405 Amendment 136oa
2017-02-13SenateHealth and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 1. S.J. 368
2017-02-13SenateHealth and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 136ka
2017-02-13SenateScheduled for hearing
2017-01-26SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 221

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback