SD HB1033 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Signed by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revise provisions regarding transaction of business by trust companies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise provisions regarding transaction of business by trust companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House Commerce and Energy Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateSigned by the Governor on February 13, 2019 H.J. 403
2019-02-11SenateDelivered to the Governor on February 11, 2019 H.J. 350
2019-02-08SenateSigned by the President S.J. 320
2019-02-07SenateSigned by the Speaker H.J. 334
2019-02-06SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 1. S.J. 294
2019-02-05SenateCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 261
2019-02-05SenateScheduled for hearing
2019-01-25SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 191
2019-01-24HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 173
2019-01-23HouseCommerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1. H.J. 155
2019-01-23HouseScheduled for hearing
2019-01-08HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 23

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback