SC S0592 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-09 - Act No. 53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Restructure The Existing Provisions That Regulate The Hunting Of These Animals, And To Provide For The Night Hunting Of These Animals By A Person With A Center Fire Rifle Using Center Fire Ammunition Or Subsonic Center Fire Ammunition

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting of feral hogs, coyotes, and armadillos

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-27 - House - House: Adoption Of Bill (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-09 Act No. 53
2015-06-08 Effective date 06/03/15
2015-06-03 Signed By Governor
2015-06-02 Ratified R 84
2015-05-28HouseRead third time and enrolled
2015-05-27HouseRoll call Yeas-89 Nays-0
2015-05-27HouseRead second time
2015-05-20HouseDebate adjourned until Wed., 5-27-15
2015-05-14HouseRecalled from Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2015-04-28HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources and Environmental Affairs
2015-04-28HouseIntroduced and read first time
2015-04-23SenateRead third time and sent to House
2015-04-22SenateRoll call Ayes-39 Nays-0
2015-04-22SenateRead second time
2015-04-16SenateCommittee report: Favorable Fish, Game and Forestry
2015-03-25SenateReferred to Committee on Fish, Game and Forestry
2015-03-25SenateIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5011710(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback