SC H4717 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Act No. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Create The "south Carolina Farm Aid Fund" To Assist Farmers Who Have Suffered At Least A Forty Percent Loss Of Agricultural Commodities As A Result Of The October 2015 Flood, To Provide That The Fund Must Be Administered By The Department Of Agriculture, To Create A Farm Aid Advisory Board To Make Recommendations, To Specify Eligibility And Grant Amounts, To Appropriate Funds From The Capital Reserve Fund To The Fund, And To Provide For The Dissolution Of The Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

S.C. Farm Aid Fund

Sponsors

Rep. Brian White [R]Rep. James Lucas [R]Rep. Davey Hiott [R]Rep. Gary Simrill [R]
Rep. Murrell Smith [R]Rep. Phillip Lowe [R]Rep. William Whitmire [R]Rep. Bill Taylor [R]
Rep. Wayne George [D]Rep. Steve Moss [R]Rep. James Smith [D]Rep. Mia McLeod [D]
Rep. William Bowers [D]Rep. Christopher Corley [R]Rep. Anne Parks [D]Rep. Cezar McKnight [D]
Rep. MaryGail Douglas [D]Rep. Patsy Knight [D]Rep. Shannon Erickson [R]Rep. William Sandifer [R]
Rep. Mark Willis [R]Rep. Roger Kirby [D]Rep. Gary Clary [R]Rep. Gilda Cobb-Hunter [D]
Rep. Kevin Hardee [R]Rep. Gregory Duckworth [R]Rep. Jeffrey Johnson [R]Rep. Harry Limehouse [R]
Rep. William Clyburn [D]Rep. Jimmy Bales [D]Rep. Jenny Horne [R]Rep. Leonidas Stavrinakis [D]
Rep. Jackie Hayes [D]Rep. Richard Yow [R]Rep. Joseph Neal [D]Rep. Ralph Kennedy [R]
Rep. Weston Newton [R]Rep. Mary Tinkler [D]Rep. Robert Riley [R]Rep. Leon Howard [D]
Rep. John King [D]Rep. Patricia Henegan [D]Rep. Robert Williams [D]Rep. Michael Anthony [D]
Rep. Alan Clemmons [R]Rep. William Crosby [R]Rep. Derham Cole [R]Rep. Joseph Daning [R]
Rep. Chandra Dillard [D]Rep. Michael Forrester [R]Rep. Laurie Funderburk [D]Sen. Michael Gambrell [R]
Rep. William Herbkersman [R]Rep. William Hixon [R]Rep. Lonnie Hosey [D]Rep. Dwight Loftis [R]
Rep. Deborah Long [R]Rep. Michael Pitts [R]Rep. Samuel Rivers [R]Rep. Todd Rutherford [D]
Rep. Mike Ryhal [R]Rep. Garry Smith [R]Rep. Don Wells [R]Rep. Walton McLeod [D]
Rep. Robert Ridgeway [D]Rep. Grady Brown [D]Rep. Justin Bamberg [D]Rep. Kenneth Hodges [D]
Rep. Terry Alexander [D]Rep. Anne Thayer [R]Rep. Joseph McEachern [D]Rep. Craig Gagnon [R]
Rep. Jackson Whipper [D]Rep. Robert Brown [D]Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D]Rep. Carl Anderson [D]
Rep. Kit Spires [R]Rep. Donna Wood [R]

Roll Calls

2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate: To Override The Veto (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - House: Override The Veto Of The Governor (Y: 112 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: Waive Rule 5.10 (Y: 92 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate: 3rd Reading (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Cloture (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-24 Act No. 174
2016-05-24 Effective date See Act for Effective Date
2016-05-18SenateVeto overridden Ayes-39 Nays-3
2016-05-17HouseVeto overridden Yeas-112 Nays-2
2016-05-16 Vetoed by Governor
2016-05-11 Ratified R 182
2016-05-04HouseRoll call Yeas-85 Nays-2
2016-05-04HouseConcurred in Senate amendment and enrolled
2016-04-29 Scrivener's error corrected
2016-04-28SenateRoll call Ayes-33 Nays-3
2016-04-28SenateRead third time and returned to House with amendments
2016-04-28SenateAmended
2016-04-27SenateRead second time
2016-04-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2016-03-18 Scrivener's error corrected
2016-03-17SenateCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Finance
2016-03-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2016-03-03SenateIntroduced and read first time
2016-03-02HouseRead third time and sent to Senate
2016-02-25HouseRoll call Yeas-95 Nays-6
2016-02-25HouseRead second time
2016-02-25HouseAmended
2016-02-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Jefferson, Anderson, Spires, Hicks
2016-02-23HouseRequests for debate-Rep
2016-02-23HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Whipper, R.L.Brown
2016-02-11HouseCommittee report: Favorable with amendment Ways and Means
2016-02-04HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Merrill
2016-02-03HouseMember(s) request name removed as sponsor: Huggins
2016-02-02HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Thayer, McEachern, Gagnon
2016-01-27HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Ridgeway, G.A.Brown, Bamberg, Hodges, Alexander
2016-01-21HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: W.J.McLeod
2016-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2016-01-21HouseIntroduced and read first time

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
461160(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=4717&session=121&summary=B
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160121.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160211.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160225.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160317.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160318.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160406.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160428.htm
Texthttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess121_2015-2016/prever/4717_20160429.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=10874
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=10875
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11574
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11598
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11599
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11777
Roll Callhttp://www.scstatehouse.gov/votehistory.php?KEY=11788

Bill Comments

feedback