SC H3521 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempt The Sale Of Cannabis By Dispensaries From State Sales Tax; And For Other Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SC Compassionate Care Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Cobb-Hunter
2017-04-20HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: McKnight
2017-03-29HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Govan
2017-03-28HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Gilliard
2017-03-22HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: Erickson
2017-01-19HouseMember(s) request name added as sponsor: King, Henegan, Taylor
2017-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs
2017-01-18HouseIntroduced and read first time

Same As/Similar To

S0212 (Similar To) 2017-01-10 - Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
12362120(n/a)See Bill Text

South Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback