PA HR613 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-8)
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Resolution recognizing the year 2020 as the "Year of the Nurse and Midwife" in Pennsylvania.
Title
Recognizing the year 2020 as the "Year of the Nurse and Midwife" in Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | House | Referred to HEALTH |