PA HB881 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-07 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.
Title
Amending the act of June 18, 1982 (P.L.549, No.159), entitled "An act providing for the administration of certain Commonwealth farmland within the Department of Agriculture," further providing for agricultural land conservation assistance grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 881 PN 1434, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00731 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00731 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2020-05-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-05-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-06 | House | Second consideration |
2020-02-04 | House | Removed from table |
2020-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-27 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-04 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |