PA HB679 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for supplemental online course initiative; and establishing the Online Course Clearinghouse Restricted Account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for supplemental online course initiative; and establishing the Online Course Clearinghouse Restricted Account.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 679 PN 730, FP (Y: 123 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-24SenateSecond consideration
2018-04-23SenateFirst consideration
2018-04-23SenateReported as committed
2017-05-31SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2017-05-23SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (123-71)
2017-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-10HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-09HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-08HouseReported as committed
2017-03-03HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=679
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0679&pn=0730
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=326
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=440
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=04/23/2018&RollCallId=801

Bill Comments

feedback