PA HB564 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for prompt payment of claims.
Title
In quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for prompt payment of claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02548 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A02548 (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-08-28 | House | Removed from table |
2020-08-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-20 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-27 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |