OR SB753 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Work Session held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals requirement that Division of Child Support provide certain spousal support enforcement services for obligees who receive public assistance but who are not also receiving child support enforcement services. Repeals requirement that Division of Child Support provide certain spousal support enforcement services for obligees who receive public assistance but who are not also receiving child support enforcement services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to spousal support enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-12HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-10HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-26SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist.
2021-04-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Beyer, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher.
2021-04-22SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-04-12SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-07SenateWork Session not held.
2021-03-29SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-02-18SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback