OR SB748 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Public Employees' Benefit Board, Oregon Educators Benefit Board and private insurers to provide insurance coverage to adult disabled children of insureds under certain circumstances. Requires Public Employees' Benefit Board, Oregon Educators Benefit Board and private insurers to provide insurance coverage to adult disabled children and adult disabled siblings] of insureds under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to benefit plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 342, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-05-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Patterson declared potential conflict of interest by unanimous consent. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Gelser declared potential conflict of interest. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Girod; Excused, 3--Heard, Johnson, President Courtney. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |