OR SB315 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts from required disclosure business, commercial, financial, operational and research data and information that is furnished, developed or generated in connection with ownership or operation of unmanned aerial system test range, if disclosure of information would cause competitive disadvantage to test range or users. Exempts from required disclosure business, commercial, financial, operational and research data and information that is furnished, developed or generated in connection with ownership or operation of unmanned aerial system test range, if disclosure of information would cause competitive disadvantage to test range or users. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public records; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 174, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-03SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-27HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-26SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Levy. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Witt; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-19HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-18HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-29HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-08HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-31SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-31SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 1--Heard; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen.
2021-03-25SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback