OR SB202 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court, under certain circumstances, to appoint legal counsel for respondent or protected person in protective proceeding. Requires court, under certain circumstances, to appoint legal counsel for respondent or protected person in protective proceeding. Requires payment for appointed counsel from guardianship or conservatorship estate of respondent or protected person or at state expense. Provides for phase-in among counties over three-year period beginning in 2022. Directs certain county circuit courts to make annual reports regarding protective proceeding statistics to Judicial Department. Directs Judicial Department to present results of reports in report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary. Sunsets reporting requirement on January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to appointment of legal counsel for certain persons in protective proceedings.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB202 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB202/Introduced |