OR SB183 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to foreign restraining orders. Provides procedure for recognition and enforcement of orders and judgments of tribal courts in courts of this state.] Modifies provisions relating to foreign restraining orders.
Title
Relating to foreign courts.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 326, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |