OR HB4152 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Chapter 97, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires State Fire Marshal to issue grants to sheriffs' offices of Multnomah County and Hood River County for expenses related to wildfire recovery, mitigation and preparedness. Requires Office of Emergency Management] State Fire Marshal to issue grants to sheriffs' offices of Multnomah County and Hood River County for expenses related to wildfire recovery, mitigation and preparedness. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to office] State Fire Marshal. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to wildfires; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseChapter 97, (2018 Laws): Effective date April 10, 2018.
2018-04-10HouseGovernor signed.
2018-03-08SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
2018-03-03SenateSecond reading.
2018-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2018-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2018-03-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-03-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Helfrich. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden.
2018-03-03HouseSecond reading.
2018-03-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2018-03-02HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-28HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2018-02-28HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2018-02-15HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4152
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4152/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27230
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27412
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433802
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=433957

Bill Comments

feedback