OR HB4055 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 22, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies laws related to vehicular hit and run.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-27 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26HouseChapter 22, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
2018-03-16HouseGovernor signed.
2018-02-28SenatePresident signed.
2018-02-28HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-02-27HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Evans, Olson.
2018-02-26SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Kruse.
2018-02-23SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2018-02-22SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-15SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-02-14HouseThird reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Witt.
2018-02-13HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-12HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2018-02-09HouseWork Session held.
2018-02-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2018-02-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-01-22HousePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/HB4055
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB4055/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27107
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=431327
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/27263
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432580
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2018R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=432788

Bill Comments

feedback