OR HB3356 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study public safety standards. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to study public safety standards. Requires report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary. Sunsets January 2, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public safety standards; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback