OR HB3140 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 253, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 253, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to statutes related to operating vehicle or boat while under influence of intoxicants that reference controlled substances to clarify applicability to psilocybin. Makes changes to statutes related to operating vehicle or boat while under influence of intoxicants that reference controlled substances to clarify applicability to psilocybin. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to psilocybin; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 253, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Hudson, Leif, Nearman, Smith G. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |