OR HB2965 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 243, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 243, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends deadline for local plans for applying foundational capabilities and implementing foundational programs related to public health to December 31, 2025. Extends deadline for local plans for applying foundational capabilities and implementing foundational programs related to public health to December 31, 2025.
Title
Relating to public health modernization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 243, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 46; Nays, 12--Breese-Iverson, Drazan, Hayden, Lewis, Moore-Green, Nearman, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Speaker Kotek; Excused, 2--Clem, Levy. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |