OR HB2845 | 2015 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Chapter 523, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]


Establishes conditions under which person may sell guaranteed asset protection waiver in connection with sale or lease of motor vehicle. Specifies conditions under which purchaser may cancel or creditor may terminate guaranteed asset protection waiver. Provides that guaranteed asset protection waiver is not insurance and is not subject to provisions of Insurance Code. Provides that person that sells guaranteed asset protection waiver may insure waiver for amount person must waive under terms of guaranteed asset protection waiver. Specifies requirements for insurance. Provides that violation of provisions of Act is unlawful practice that is subject to enforcement under Unlawful Trade Practices Act. Sunsets provisions of Act on January 2, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to guaranteed asset protection waivers.


Roll Calls

2015-06-11 - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-06-26HouseChapter 523, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-06-22HouseGovernor signed.
2015-06-17SenatePresident signed.
2015-06-15HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-06-11HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Taylor; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2015-06-09SenateThird reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2015-06-08SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-04SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-04-10SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2015-04-09SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-04-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 60.
2015-04-07HouseSecond reading.
2015-04-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-05HouseReferred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness.
2015-02-02HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21357
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=339620
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22911
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=357700
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=358471

Bill Comments