OR HB2361 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prioritizes access to health care provider incentive program by behavioral health services providers serving Latino, Latina and Latinx individuals in Morrow, Malheur, Hood River and Umatilla counties. Prioritizes access to health care provider incentive program by behavioral health services providers serving Latino, Latina and Latinx individuals in Morrow, Malheur, Hood River and Umatilla counties.
Title
Relating to mental health care for underserved populations in rural counties; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] |
Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Andrea Valderrama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2361 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2361/Introduced |