OR HB2333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 220, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 220, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to report information regarding prescription of psychotropic medications to children in foster care. Directs Department of Human Services to report information regarding prescription of psychotropic medications to children in foster care.
Title
Relating to use of psychotropic medications for children in foster care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 220, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bonham. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |