OR HB2104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies definition of "current caretaker." . Modifies definition of "current caretaker." Grants juvenile court continuing wardship jurisdiction upon establishment of permanent or durable guardianship regardless of whether original bases for wardship jurisdiction continue to exist.].
Title
Relating to wards.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Clem, Leif, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Prusak. |
2021-04-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-16 | House | Subsequent referral to Judiciary rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Judiciary be rescinded. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Human Services with subsequent referral to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |