OR HB2086 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 667, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 667, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish peer and community-driven programs that provide culturally specific and culturally responsive behavioral health services to people of color, tribal communities and people of lived experience. Appropriates moneys to] Requires Oregon Health Authority for] to establish peer and community-driven programs that provide culturally specific and culturally responsive behavioral health services that are directly responsive to and driven by] to people of color, tribal communities and people of lived experience. Increases funding to reintegrate into community criminal defendants found unfit to proceed in criminal proceeding.] Appropriates moneys to authority to construct and operate secure residential treatment facility to serve up to 39 individuals.] Requires authority to reimburse cost of co-occurring mental health and substance use disorder treatment paid for on fee-for-service basis at enhanced rate based on specified factors. Requires authority to conduct study of reimbursement rates for co-occurring disorder treatments and study of Medicaid rates paid for behavioral health services compared to physical health services and rates paid for addiction treatment services compared to mental health services. Imposes requirements on authority regarding reimbursement for services provided by mental and behavioral health providers to medical assistance recipients.] Requires authority to continually evaluate and revise administrative rules to reduce regulatory burden on providers. Directs authority to adopt rules requiring coordinated care organizations to provide housing navigation services and address social determinants of health through care coordination. Requires intensive behavioral health treatment providers, coordinated care organizations and insurers to collect and report to authority data regarding access to intensive behavioral health] treatment for children and adolescents with high acuity behavioral health needs. Requires authority to contract with third-party vendor to survey medical assistance recipients about their experiences with behavioral health care and services. Requires Oregon Health Policy Board, by February 1, 2022, to establish Behavioral Health Committee consisting of specified members to establish quality metrics for behavioral health services provided by coordinated care organizations and providers who contract with authority and establish incentives to improve quality of behavioral health services. Requires authority to make specified reports to Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to individuals with behavioral health disorders; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 667, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Reschke, Wallan; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Behavioral Health with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |