OR HB2080 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Office of Pharmaceutical Purchasing in Oregon Health Authority and specifies duties. Establishes Office of Pharmaceutical Purchasing in Oregon Health Authority and specifies duties. Requires office to administer multistate prescription drug purchasing consortium. Authorizes Oregon Health Authority to require prior authorization for drugs under specified conditions.
Title
Relating to pharmaceuticals.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-16 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2080 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2080/Introduced |