OH SB36 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 5713.31, 5713.34, and 5715.01 of the Revised Code to require that the computation of the capitalization rate for the purposes of determining CAUV of agricultural land be computed using a method that excludes appreciation and equity buildup and to stipulate that CAUV land used for a conservation practice or enrolled in a federal land retirement or conservation program for at least three years must be valued at the lowest of the values assigned on the basis of soil type.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specify how value of agricultural land is computed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-05-11HouseIntroduced
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2017-02-08SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5713Amended CodeCitation Text
571331Amended CodeCitation Text
571334Amended CodeCitation Text
5715Amended CodeCitation Text
571501Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback