Ohio Recently Introduced Bills

Browse Legislation - State Dashboard - View Trending

BillSummaryLast Action
HB330To amend section 4123.68 of the Revised Code regarding charging workers' compensation experience in firefighter cancer claims.2019-09-12
Introduced
HB331To amend section 3517.10 of the Revised Code to require an entity to include with the form to be filed with the Secretary of State when appointing a campaign treasurer a notarized signature of that treasurer acknowledging the appointment and to amend...2019-09-12
Introduced
HB333To amend sections 3314.03, 3326.11, and 3328.24 and to enact section 3301.943 of the Revised Code to permit public schools to enter into agreements with third parties to provide digital student record storage, management, and retrieval.2019-09-12
Introduced
HB332To enact sections 5534.821 and 5534.822 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 66 in Defiance County as the "Purple Heart Trail of Defiance County" and to designate the bridge spanning the Maumee River that is part of State Route 6...2019-09-12
Introduced
SR360Honoring New Hope Baptist Church on its One Hundred Sixty-fifth Anniversary.2019-09-11
Adopted
SB195To amend section 3717.22 of the Revised Code to revise the exemption from retail food establishment licensure that applies to certain wineries.2019-09-11
Introduced
SCR5To urge the Congress of the United States to enact the Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act.2019-09-11
Offered
SR361Honoring the Village of Versailles on its Two Hundredth Anniversary.2019-09-11
Adopted
SR362Honoring Brett Heidecker as the 2019 Ohio Fire Prevention Educator of the Year.2019-09-11
Adopted
SB192To require the Ohio History Connection to designate Poindexter Village as a state historic site.2019-09-11
SB194To amend sections 3506.01, 3506.04, 3506.05, 3506.06, 3506.07, 3506.10, 3513.041, 3513.05, 3513.262, and 3513.263 and to enact section 3506.16 of the Revised Code to rename the Board of Voting Machine Examiners as the Board of Voting Equipment Examin...2019-09-11
HB329To amend sections 4713.50, 4713.51, and 4713.64 of the Revised Code to prohibit the provision of sun lamp tanning services to individuals under age 18.2019-09-09
Introduced
SR359Honoring New Philadelphia First Christian Church on its One Hundred Seventy-fifth Anniversary.2019-09-09
Adopted
SB193To amend section 4501.21 and to enact section 4503.506 of the Revised Code to create the "A Kid Again" license plate.2019-09-11
SR357Honoring Camp Stambaugh on its One Hundredth Anniversary.2019-09-09
Adopted
SR358Honoring the Cleveland Public Library on its One Hundred Fiftieth Anniversary.2019-09-09
Adopted
SB188To amend section 5739.121 of the Revised Code to allow vendors to receive a refund of sales tax remitted for certain bad debts charged off as uncollectible by credit account lenders.2019-09-03
Introduced
SB191To enact section 3509.031 of the Revised Code to authorize the Secretary of State to establish a secure online process for applying to vote by absent voter's ballots.2019-09-04
Introduced
SR356Honoring Batdorf Farm on the celebration of its One Hundredth Anniversary.2019-09-04
Adopted
SB189To amend section 4509.05 of the Revised Code to alter the requirements governing personal motor vehicle abstracts provided by the Bureau of Motor Vehicles. 2019-09-11
SB190To amend sections 5747.02, 5747.08, and 5747.98 and to enact section 5747.64 of the Revised Code to allow an income tax credit for law enforcement officials who purchase safety or protective items to be used in the course of official law enforcement ...2019-09-03
Introduced
HB328To enact section 3737.52 of the Revised Code to prohibit the use of class B firefighting foam containing intentionally added PFAS chemicals for testing and training purposes beginning January 1, 2020.2019-09-03
Introduced
HR222Designating Good Neighbor Day in Ohio,2019-09-03
Adopted
HR221Honoring Withrow University High School on the One Hundredth Anniversary of its founding.2019-09-03
Adopted
SB187To amend section 2919.22 of the Revised Code to prohibit a sexually suggestive performance by a minor and, if the offender is a D liquor permit holder, to require the court to order the revocation of the permit.2019-08-28
Introduced
SR355Honoring Benevolent and Protective Order of Elks Ashland Lodge 1360 on its One Hundredth Anniversary.2019-08-29
Adopted
SR352Honoring Larry Smoot as the 2019 Golf Coach of the Year.2019-08-28
Adopted
SR353Honoring Snowy Oak Tree Farm as the 2019 Ohio Forestry Association Tree Farm of the Year.2019-08-28
Adopted
SR354Honoring Dylan Hyun on winning a 2019 Optimist International Oratorical Regional Championship.2019-08-28
Adopted
HB324To amend sections 2307.80, 2315.18, 2315.21, 2323.43, and 3345.40 of the Revised Code to raise the limitations on damages for noneconomic loss and punitive damages in certain tort actions based on adjustments for inflation from the year 2005 to 2019.2019-08-28
Introduced
HB327To enact section 4511.515 of the Revised Code to prohibit a business from using an unmanned aerial vehicle to deliver packages.2019-08-28
Introduced
HB326To amend sections 145.362 and 3309.41 and to enact section 145.364 of the Revised Code to allow a Public Employees Retirement System or School Employees Retirement System disability benefit recipient elected to certain offices to continue receiving a...2019-08-28
Introduced
HB322To amend sections 3319.111, 3319.22, 3319.223, 3319.227, 3319.229, and 3319.26 of the Revised Code to revise the Ohio Teacher Residency Program.2019-08-28
Introduced
HB323To amend sections 2925.02, 2925.03, 2925.11, 2925.12, 2925.14, 2925.23, 2925.36, 3701.048, 3715.872, 3719.06, 3719.12, 3719.121, 3719.81, 3795.01, 4723.01, 4729.01, 4729.51, 4731.054, 4731.22, 4732.01, 4732.02, 4732.17, 4732.20, 4732.99, and 5123.47 ...2019-08-28
Introduced
HB325To enact section 5.293 of the Revised Code to designate February 18 as "Toni Morrison Day."2019-08-28
Introduced
SR351Honoring Joe Uecker for his outstanding service as a member of the Ohio Senate.2019-08-26
Adopted
SR350Honoring Mark Flanders for thirty years of commendable service to the Ohio Legislative Service Commission.2019-08-26
Adopted
SR349Honoring Jacob Riffel as a 2019 Microsoft Office Specialist U.S. National Champion.2019-08-26
Adopted
HR219Designating September 22-28,2019 as Independent Retailers Week in Ohio.2019-08-22
Adopted
HR220Honoring Hunter Armstrong as a 2019 Speedo USA Junior National Champion.2019-08-22
Adopted
HR216Honoring Jeff Winkle as the 2019 Ohio Librarian of the Year.2019-08-19
Adopted
HR218Honoring the Willoughby Fire Department on its One Hundred Twenty-fifth Anniversary.2019-08-19
Adopted
SR348Honoring Copley Township on its Two Hundredth Anniversary.2019-08-21
Adopted
SB186To amend sections 3501.01, 3501.05, 3503.09, 3503.10, 3503.12, 3503.13, 3503.14, 3503.15, 3503.16, 3503.19, 3503.20, 3503.21, 3503.23, 3503.24, 3503.26, 3503.28, 3503.30, 3503.33, 3505.18, 3505.181, 3505.183, 3509.02, 3509.03, 3509.04, 3509.05, 3509....2019-08-21
Introduced
HR217Honoring Anthony Thompson as a 2019 Elks National Hoop Shoot Champion.2019-08-19
Adopted
SB185To enact section 5534.871 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 550 in Washington County the "SGT Meredith L. Barnett Memorial Highway."2019-09-11
SR345Honoring Steve Asmus as the 2019 National Federation of State High School Associations Official of the Year for wrestling.2019-08-19
Adopted
SR347Honoring Chika Nkwocha on receiving a Silver Medal at the 2019 ACT-SO National Competition.2019-08-19
Adopted
SR346Honoring Connor Harris on receiving a Bronze Medal at the 2019 ACT-SO National Competition.2019-08-19
Adopted
SB184To amend sections 109.57, 2923.125, 2923.128, and 2923.13 and to enact sections 2923.26, 2923.27, 2923.28, 2923.29, 2923.30, and 2923.99 of the Revised Code to enact the Extreme Risk Protection Order Act to allow family members, household members, an...2019-09-11
feedback