NJ SJR40 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates last full week of September of each year as "New Jersey Wine Week."
Title
Designates last full week of September of each year as "New Jersey Wine Week."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR58 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SJR40 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SJR/40_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR40 |