NJ S972 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3600
Note: Carry Over of previous A5118
Note: Carry Over of previous A5118
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes matching grant program in DCA to support community-based nonprofit organizations that provide shelter services during Code Blue alerts.
Title
Establishes matching grant program in DCA to support community-based nonprofit organizations that provide shelter services during Code Blue alerts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3600 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5118 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A1241 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee
A5118 (Carry Over) 2023-01-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
A1241 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Women's Affairs Committee