NJ S1921 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Vetoed on June 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-27 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes animal cruelty offense of cruel confinement of a gestating pig.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes animal cruelty offense of cruel confinement of a gestating pig.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 5 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3250 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-27AssemblyAbsolute Veto, Received in the Senate
2013-05-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-4)
2013-04-15SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2013-03-21AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (60-5-11)
2013-03-21AssemblySubstituted for A3250 (1R)
2013-03-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2012-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-1)
2012-06-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2012-05-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3250 (Same As) 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S1921 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback