NJ S1565 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S983
Note: Carry Over of previous A2981

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires municipalities to file copies of tax abatement and exemption agreements with county chief financial officer and county counsel within 10 days of execution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires municipalities to file copies of tax abatement and exemption agreements with county chief financial officer and county counsel within 10 days of execution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2079 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S983 (Carry Over) 2020-03-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2981 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback