NJ A3250 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - Substituted by S1921 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes animal cruelty offense of cruel confinement of a gestating pig.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes animal cruelty offense of cruel confinement of a gestating pig.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-21AssemblySubstituted by S1921 (1R)
2013-03-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2012-09-24AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1921 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback