NJ A4772 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires public community water systems to provide customers with certain information regarding lead in drinking water. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires public community water systems to provide customers with certain information regarding lead in drinking water. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-05-20AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-11AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3391 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback