NJ A4053 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3080

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Imposes moratorium on affordable housing litigation through December 31, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Imposes moratorium on affordable housing litigation through December 31, 2018.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee

Same As/Similar To

S268 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3080 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback