NE LR378CA | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Constitutional amendment to guarantee the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional amendment to guarantee the right to engage in certain farming and ranching practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-20LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2016-03-24LegislatureKuehn MO231 approved
2016-03-24LegislatureKuehn MO231 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
2016-03-23LegislatureChambers MO229 failed
2016-03-23LegislatureChambers MO229 Bracket until April 20, 2016 filed
2016-03-23LegislatureAgriculture AM2251 pending
2016-03-23LegislatureChambers MO226 failed
2016-03-23LegislatureChambers MO226 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed
2016-03-23LegislatureSullivan name withdrawn
2016-03-22LegislatureKuehn AM2638 filed
2016-03-17LegislatureJohnson AM2562 filed
2016-03-15LegislatureKuehn AM2586 filed
2016-03-15LegislatureHarr AM2533 filed
2016-03-15LegislatureHarr AM2530 filed
2016-03-15LegislatureHarr AM2537 filed
2016-03-09LegislatureAgriculture AM2251 filed
2016-03-09LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2251
2016-02-18LegislatureKuehn priority resolution
2016-02-10LegislatureKolterman name added
2016-02-08LegislatureMcCoy name added
2016-02-03LegislatureHughes name added
2016-02-03LegislatureFriesen name added
2016-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 23, 2016
2016-01-20LegislatureWilliams name added
2016-01-20LegislatureWatermeier name added
2016-01-20LegislatureStinner name added
2016-01-20LegislatureCraighead name added
2016-01-20LegislatureBloomfield name added
2016-01-15LegislatureSullivan name added
2016-01-15LegislatureSchnoor name added
2016-01-15LegislatureScheer name added
2016-01-15LegislatureKintner name added
2016-01-15LegislatureGroene name added
2016-01-15LegislatureBrasch name added
2016-01-07LegislatureReferred to Agriculture Committee
2016-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback