NE LR221 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Notice of hearing for September 22, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study to review the credentialing requirements for interior designers for purposes of the Occupational Board Reform Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study to review the credentialing requirements for interior designers for purposes of the Occupational Board Reform Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-26LegislatureNotice of hearing for September 22, 2023
2023-05-23LegislatureReferred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
2023-05-18LegislatureReferred to Executive Board
2023-05-18LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback