NE LR206 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-02 - Notice of hearing for December 07, 2017
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-02 - Notice of hearing for December 07, 2017
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the potential for counties to have additional authority to pass ordinances within county boundaries
Title
Interim study to examine the potential for counties to have additional authority to pass ordinances within county boundaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-02 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 07, 2017 |
2017-05-15 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=33612 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR206.pdf |