NE LB915 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to animal cruelty and create the offense of obtaining employment at an animal facility with intent to disrupt operations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to animal cruelty and create the offense of obtaining employment at an animal facility with intent to disrupt operations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Indefinitely postponed
2012-01-20 Notice of hearing for January 31, 2012
2012-01-12 Referred to Agriculture Committee
2012-01-10 Date of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback