NE LB763 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibit obstruction of a public power district employee

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibit obstruction of a public power district employee

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-30LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2018
2018-01-08LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-03LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback