NE LB72 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Approved by Governor on May 23, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to cities and villages filing for bankruptcy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to cities and villages filing for bankruptcy

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-4-4 (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 41-4-4 (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on May 23, 2017
2017-05-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on May 18, 2017
2017-05-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2017-05-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 41-4-4
2017-05-18LegislatureBlood FA80 withdrawn
2017-05-18LegislatureBlood FA80 filed
2017-05-18LegislatureMotion to return to Select File withdrawn
2017-05-16LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST35
2017-05-15LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2017-05-15LegislatureSchumacher AM1404 adopted
2017-05-15LegislatureSchumacher AM1404 filed
2017-05-15LegislatureSchumacher AM1360 withdrawn
2017-05-15LegislatureMcDonnell AM789 withdrawn
2017-05-15LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER57 adopted
2017-05-11LegislatureSchumacher AM1360 filed
2017-04-18LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER57 filed
2017-04-18LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER57
2017-04-12LegislatureMcDonnell AM789 refiled
2017-04-12LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2017-04-12LegislatureSchumacher MO80 prevailed
2017-04-12LegislatureSchumacher MO80 Invoke cloture filed
2017-04-12LegislatureMcDonnell AM789 withdrawn
2017-04-12LegislatureCrawford AM804 withdrawn
2017-03-29LegislatureCrawford AM804 pending
2017-03-29LegislatureCrawford AM804 filed
2017-03-29LegislatureMcDonnell AM789 filed
2017-03-29LegislatureHansen AM787 withdrawn
2017-03-29LegislatureHansen AM787 filed
2017-03-03LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill
2017-02-16LegislaturePlaced on General File
2017-01-31LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2017
2017-01-09LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2017-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback