NE LB622 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Title
Change the Sports Arena Facility Financing Assistance Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB622 amended into LB727 by AM1396 |
2023-03-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 08, 2023 |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |