NE LB577 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to collection of delinquent real property taxes by sale of real property
Title
Change provisions relating to collection of delinquent real property taxes by sale of real property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2023-03-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 23, 2023 |
2023-01-24 | Legislature | Wayne name added |
2023-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2023-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |