NE LB380 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change income tax rates, itemized deductions, and standard deductions
Title
Change income tax rates, itemized deductions, and standard deductions
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-07 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 15, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31412 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB380.pdf |