NE LB325 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain purchases of energy star qualified products from sales and use taxes
Title
Exempt certain purchases of energy star qualified products from sales and use taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2017 |
2017-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2017-01-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31428 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB325.pdf |