NE LB1010 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change procedures for determining competency to stand trial in counties containing a city of the primary class
Title
Change procedures for determining competency to stand trial in counties containing a city of the primary class
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34012 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1010.pdf |